+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On December 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 29, 2023 in the House:
- Passed
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Reported Transportation
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (8)
February 28, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
December 13, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
December 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
December 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
December 5, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
November 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 75
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
March 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (125)
Type:
Primary Sponsor