+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Substituted
On December 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Criminal Justice
- Received in Senate
On December 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On November 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Substituted
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Introduced
+ − Vote
December 4, 2013: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor