+ − Effective Date
- August 17, 2021
+ − Full Texts (18)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 17, 2021 in the House:
- Effective 8-17-2021
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signed By The Governor
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported Judiciary
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Judiciary
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Civil Justice
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Civil Justice
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor