+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 30, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On December 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Finance
- Passed
On December 18, 2024 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On June 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Finance
On June 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 12, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On May 22, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Finance
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Re-referred to Finance Rules and Reference
On June 7, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute - Re-referred to Rules and Reference Families and Aging
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Families and Aging
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (5)
+ − Votes (10)
December 18, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 8
December 18, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 12, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 20
May 22, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 8
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
October 11, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
June 13, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 12
June 7, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 13
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 91
+ − Sponsors (122)
Type:
Primary Sponsor