+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee General Government
On December 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 4, 2024 in the House:
- Reported State and Local Government
- Passed
On November 19, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee State and Local Government
On November 12, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Vote
December 4, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor