+ − Full Texts (18)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 22, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended Agriculture and Natural Resources
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Agriculture and Natural Resources
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Passed - Amended
- Informally passed
- Reported - Substitute Agriculture and Rural Development
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Agriculture and Rural Development
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor