+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (2)
On May 21, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight
On May 20, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (7)
June 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 24, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 8
January 10, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 27
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 24
December 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 26
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor