+ − Full Texts (20)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Sections 3 and 4 effective October 9, 2021
- Signed By The Governor
- Sent To The Governor
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Government Oversight and Reform
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight and Reform
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute State and Local Government
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee State and Local Government
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor