+ − Full Texts (31)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Effective 10/22/19
On July 23, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On July 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed - Amended
- Informally passed
- Reported - Substitute Energy and Public Utilities
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Energy and Public Utilities
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
- Informally passed
- Reported - Substitute Energy and Natural Resources
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred Rules and Reference
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy Generation
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Energy and Natural Resources
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor