+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Agriculture and Natural Resources
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Reported State and Local Government
On May 21, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee State and Local Government
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 4
June 25, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor