+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (2)
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Civil Justice
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (4)
October 30, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 3
March 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
March 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (110)
Type:
Primary Sponsor