+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Effective 3/20/19
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended
On September 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reported
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor