+ − Effective Date
- April 06, 2023
+ − Full Texts (17)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2023 in the House:
- Effective 4-6-2023
On January 5, 2023 in the House:
- Signed By The Governor
On December 29, 2022 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On December 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Transportation
On December 14, 2022 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
On November 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Transportation and Public Safety
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation and Public Safety
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor