+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported - Amended
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor