+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported - Amended
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor