+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On December 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 29, 2023 in the House:
- Passed
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Transportation
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (3)
November 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 74
March 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (112)
Type:
Primary Sponsor