+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (3)
On December 4, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Public Health Policy
On May 21, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Public Health Policy
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (3)
December 4, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
June 27, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
April 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (94)
Type:
Primary Sponsor