+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 30, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On December 18, 2024 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Judiciary
- Passed
On November 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Judiciary
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Criminal Justice
On May 21, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Criminal Justice
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (6)
December 18, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 89
December 18, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 96
June 25, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
May 8, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (96)
Type:
Primary Sponsor