+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 1, 2016 in the House:
- Line item veto receipt
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective 7/1/15Certain provisions effective on other dates
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference managers: Sens. - Manning, Patton, Cafaro
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Conference managers: Reps. - Smith, R., Grossman, Reece
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Refused to concur in Senate amendments
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (76)
Type:
Primary Sponsor