+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2023 in the House:
- Emergency Act; Conforming amendments effective December 29, 2023
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Signed By The Governor
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended Local Government
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Local Government
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute State and Local Government
- Passed
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee State and Local Government
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Fiscal Notes (6)
+ − Votes (8)
November 15, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 94
October 11, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
June 28, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 32
June 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
March 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 31
March 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 95
March 28, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (124)
Type:
Primary Sponsor