+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (4)
On December 3, 2024 in the House:
- Recalled to Rules and Reference Rules and Reference
- Reported - Re-referred to Civil Justice Rules and Reference
On May 21, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (3)
December 3, 2024: Re-referred
- Yeas: 12
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 30
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (76)
Type:
Primary Sponsor