+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended
On September 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor