+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (5)
On December 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 14, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
On December 13, 2022 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Health
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Health
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor