+ − Effective Date
- September 20, 2024
+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 21, 2024 in the House:
- Signed By The Governor
On June 11, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On May 22, 2024 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Community Revitalization
- Passed
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Community Revitalization
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 24, 2023 in the House:
- Passed
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Criminal Justice
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Criminal Justice
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Fiscal Notes (6)
+ − Votes (8)
May 22, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 8
May 8, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 18
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
May 24, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 8
March 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
September 15, 2021: Adopted
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
September 14, 2021: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (111)
Type:
Primary Sponsor