+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On December 17, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Re-referred to Finance Rules and Reference
On December 16, 2024 in the House:
- Re-referred Rules and Reference
On December 11, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Government Oversight
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight
On April 22, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (2)
December 17, 2024: Re-referred
- Yeas: 12
December 11, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor