+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 30, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On December 18, 2024 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On December 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed
On December 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Local Government
On November 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Local Government
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute State and Local Government
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee State and Local Government
On April 22, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Votes (7)
December 18, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 3
December 11, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 30
December 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 96
June 25, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
November 16, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 13, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor