+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On September 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor