+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On June 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended Select Committee on Housing
- Passed
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Select Committee on Housing
On May 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Civil Justice
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Civil Justice
On March 27, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 92
June 26, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
May 8, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
May 1, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
January 10, 2024: Adopted
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor