+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: March 5, 2015
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's action
On November 25, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On November 19, 2014 in the House:
- Concurrence
On November 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On November 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration: Amended
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Medicaid, Health & Human Services
- Received in Senate
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Health and Aging
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
November 19, 2014: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 33
May 7, 2014: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 88
+ − Sponsors (90)
Type:
Primary Sponsor