+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On December 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 6, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On November 30, 2016 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor