+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Judiciary
On December 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 30, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
- Reported Criminal Justice
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Criminal Justice
On October 19, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor