+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 28, 2018 in the House:
- Effective 9/28/18
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On December 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor