+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 31, 2016 in the House:
- Effective 8/31/16
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
- Reported
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (105)
Type:
Primary Sponsor