+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (2)
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Energy and Natural Resources
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (7)
December 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
November 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
April 20, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
April 19, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 5
December 13, 2022: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (128)
Type:
Primary Sponsor