+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (3)
On November 26, 2024 in the House:
- Reported State and Local Government
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee State and Local Government
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (5)
November 26, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
June 26, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
May 24, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 88
May 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor