+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (2)
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
December 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
June 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor