+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (2)
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Finance
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 91
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (82)
Type:
Primary Sponsor