+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (2)
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (4)
January 18, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
December 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 92
May 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (108)
Type:
Primary Sponsor