+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Health
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 20, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Public Health Policy
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Public Health Policy
On February 5, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 95
June 20, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor