+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's action
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Concurrence
On December 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration: Amended
- Committee report: Substituted
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Medicaid, Health & Human Services
- Received in Senate
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report
On December 23, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Health and Aging
- Introduced
+ − Votes (6)
December 17, 2014: Emergency clause stood
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 5
December 17, 2014: SA Concurred in
- Yeas: 90
December 10, 2014: Motion to Table Amendment
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 9
December 10, 2014: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 3
December 10, 2014: Third Consideration - Emergency Clause
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 9
April 2, 2014: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor