+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reported
On October 17, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On October 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor