+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On June 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 12, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Transportation
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On January 18, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 12, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 92
May 8, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
December 5, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (115)
Type:
Primary Sponsor