+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Ways and Means
On June 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 12, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 10, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Ways and Means
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Ways and Means
On January 16, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (6)
June 12, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
June 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
December 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 9
June 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
April 26, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (87)
Type:
Primary Sponsor