+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (3)
On December 4, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Economic and Workforce Development
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Economic and Workforce Development
On January 8, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (3)
December 4, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
June 27, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
January 24, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 35
+ − Sponsors (94)
Type:
Primary Sponsor