+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On May 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 22, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Transportation
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 22, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
April 24, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 87
October 30, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (104)
Type:
Primary Sponsor