+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 30, 2024 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On December 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed
On December 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Agriculture and Natural Resources
On June 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Agriculture and Natural Resources
On June 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 12, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On May 22, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Agriculture
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Agriculture
On December 14, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (4)
December 18, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 30
December 11, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
June 12, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 91
May 22, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (122)
Type:
Primary Sponsor