+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight
On May 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 22, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Government Oversight
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight
On December 12, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 7
April 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
February 7, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (110)
Type:
Primary Sponsor