+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Health
On May 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 22, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Behavioral Health
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Behavioral Health
On December 4, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 5
May 8, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (72)
Type:
Primary Sponsor