+ − Effective Date
- March 02, 2022
+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 12, 2023 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
- Signed By The Governor
- Emergency: Amendments to R.C. 2305.111 effective October 12, 2023; R.C. 2950.021 effective January 11, 2024; Amendments to R.C. 2305.111 reversed effective October 12, 2028
On October 11, 2023 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On September 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended Judiciary
- Passed
On April 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Judiciary
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Passed
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Civil Justice
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Civil Justice
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Fiscal Notes (6)
+ − Votes (5)
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
October 11, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 88
September 27, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
March 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 95
March 16, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (129)
Type:
Primary Sponsor