+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Finance
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Finance
On June 18, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Re-referred to Finance Rules and Reference
On June 12, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute - Re-referred to Rules and Reference Economic and Workforce Development
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Economic and Workforce Development
On December 4, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (6)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 34
June 25, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 12
June 18, 2024: Re-referred
- Yeas: 11
June 12, 2024: Re-referred
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 8
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (119)
Type:
Primary Sponsor